NY A07929 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the collection of certain demographic information about the sexual orientation and gender identity by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Title
Requires the collection of certain demographic information about the sexual orientation and gender identity by certain state agencies, boards and commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.191 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.205 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7929 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1268 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s6321 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.205 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.205 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00047 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06321 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.191
S06321 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.191