NY A07933 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of drilling fluids, brine and flowback water from wells, pools or fields on any highway for any purpose including but not limited to de-icing or dust suppression.
Title
Prohibits the use of drilling fluids, brine and flowback water from wells, pools or fields on any highway for any purpose including but not limited to de-icing or dust suppression.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.296 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.409 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.409 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01858 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION