NY A07934 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an open primary system for all state and congressional elections.
Title
Establishes an open primary system for all state and congressional elections.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | referred to election law |