NY A07947 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - approval memo.69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts beer tastings from retail sales and compensating use taxes when the beer tasting meets certain limitations on the amount of beer provided or sold to a person in a calendar day.
Title
Exempts beer tastings from retail sales and compensating use taxes when the beer tasting meets certain limitations on the amount of beer provided or sold to a person in a calendar day.
Sponsors
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | approval memo.69 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.722 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1708 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6289A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.411 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.411 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | print number 7947a |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06289 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - approval memo.69