NY A07953 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.300
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.300
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to patronage capital contributions, allocations and retirements.
Title
Relates to patronage capital contributions, allocations and retirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.300 |
2018-09-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.333 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6244A |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1002 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7953a |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S06244 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7953A