NY A07958 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the court to issue a provisional sex offender risk level determination where it is anticipated that a risk level will not be set by the date of an inmate's scheduled discharge, parole or release from a correctional facility, local correctional facility or hospital.
Title
Authorizes the court to issue a provisional sex offender risk level determination where it is anticipated that a risk level will not be set by the date of an inmate's scheduled discharge, parole or release from a correctional facility, local correctional facility or hospital.
Sponsors
Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to correction |