NY A07966 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the amount of the supplemental basic tuition for charter schools.
Title
Relates to the amount of the supplemental basic tuition for charter schools.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.334 |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1454 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6551C |
2018-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7966c |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 7966b |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.565 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.256 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.256 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | print number 7966a |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06551 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7966C