NY A07971 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prevents individuals from being denied standing in private actions alleging violations of the environmental quality review provisions of the environmental conservation law solely on the basis that the injury alleged by such individual does not differ in kind or degree from the injury that would be suffered by the public at large.
Title
Prevents individuals from being denied standing in private actions alleging violations of the environmental quality review provisions of the environmental conservation law solely on the basis that the injury alleged by such individual does not differ in kind or degree from the injury that would be suffered by the public at large.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.462 |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07548 (Same As) 2020-01-24 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION