NY A07976 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the autism spectrum disorders advisory board to improve outreach to minority group members relating to children with such disorders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the autism spectrum disorders advisory board to improve outreach to minority group members relating to children with such disorders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.227
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1716
2018-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5534A
2018-03-26SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2018-03-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-26Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.566
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.181
2017-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.181
2017-06-12Assemblyreported
2017-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-23Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S05534 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7976

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07976&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07976&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07976
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07976&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07976&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07976&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7976#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback