NY A07994 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an arts fund to receive contributions for the support of the New York state council on the arts through a personal income tax return check-off; provides that for tax years on or after January 1, 2019, any individual may elect to contribute to the arts fund by indicating such intent on a tax form.
Title
Establishes an arts fund to receive contributions for the support of the New York state council on the arts through a personal income tax return check-off; provides that for tax years on or after January 1, 2019, any individual may elect to contribute to the arts fund by indicating such intent on a tax form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.14 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.467 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.414 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7994 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.259 |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s3570 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.414 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.414 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03570 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.14