NY A08002 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - print number 8002a
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - print number 8002a
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of veterans' services to provide the division's copy of the veteran's DD-214 form to the appropriate county veterans' service agency upon the release of veterans from service.
Title
Requires the division of veterans' services to provide the division's copy of the veteran's DD-214 form to the appropriate county veterans' service agency upon the release of veterans from service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Assembly | print number 8002a |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S07051 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES