NY A08003 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows for service by mail to a nominated executor's domicile when exercising the right of election by a surviving spouse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows for service by mail to a nominated executor's domicile when exercising the right of election by a surviving spouse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.228
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-04-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-04-30Senate3RD READING CAL.324
2018-04-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6137
2018-03-26SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2018-03-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-26Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.571
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.258
2017-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.258
2017-06-13Assemblyreported
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-25Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06137 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8003

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08003&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08003&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08003
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08003&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08003&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08003&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8003#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback