NY A08013 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system as the "Roger J. Mazal Memorial Bridge".
Title
Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system as the "Roger J. Mazal Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.144 |
2019-07-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.607 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8013a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1787 |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6213A |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6213a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.607 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.607 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | print number 8013a |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06213 (Same As) 2019-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.144