NY A08019 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s6320a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a conspicuous memorandum regarding the disruption of vital services for residents of the New York city housing authority detailing a process and timeframe such residents can report such disruption for inspection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a conspicuous memorandum regarding the disruption of vital services for residents of the New York city housing authority detailing a process and timeframe such residents can report such disruption for inspection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s6320a
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.674
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-16Assemblyprint number 8019a
2019-06-16Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-30Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S06320 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08019
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08019A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback