NY A08025 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates temporary manufacturing permits for alcoholic beverage manufacturers.
Title
Creates temporary manufacturing permits for alcoholic beverage manufacturers.
Sponsors
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. D. Billy Jones [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.305 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.298 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.298 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to economic development |