NY A08035 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.290
Status: Introduced on May 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.290
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2009 to November 30, 2011, the authorization granted to the county of Madison to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2009 to November 30, 2011, the authorization granted to the county of Madison to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-10 | substituted by s5120 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.161 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-05-01 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05120 (Same As) 2009-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.290
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08035&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |