NY A08057 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of number plates to manufacturers of motor vehicles and relates to the use of such plates.
Title
Authorizes the issuance of number plates to manufacturers of motor vehicles and relates to the use of such plates.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.706 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.629 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8057 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1301 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3874A |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3874a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.629 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.629 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03874 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.706