NY A08058 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s6337a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes certified first responders in a program relating to recertification of persons providing emergency medical care and removes the designation of such program as a pilot or demonstration program; and extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to recertification of persons providing emergency medical care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes certified first responders in a program relating to recertification of persons providing emergency medical care and removes the designation of such program as a pilot or demonstration program; and extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to recertification of persons providing emergency medical care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s6337a
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.417
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.417
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 8058a
2019-06-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to rules
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-31Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06337 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.87

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08058&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08058&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08058
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08058&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08058A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08058&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08058&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08058&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback