NY A08066 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - print number 8066b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - print number 8066b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for advance payment of the earned income credit by employers, the commissioner of the department of tax and finance and the commissioner of New York City's department of finance.
Title
Provides for advance payment of the earned income credit by employers, the commissioner of the department of tax and finance and the commissioner of New York City's department of finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | print number 8066b |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 8066a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06259 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES