NY A08068 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - print number 8068a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - print number 8068a
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates unreasonable fees levied on tenants for reproductions of keys by preventing landlords from charging tenants more than 110% of the actual cost for the reproduction of such keys.
Title
Eliminates unreasonable fees levied on tenants for reproductions of keys by preventing landlords from charging tenants more than 110% of the actual cost for the reproduction of such keys.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | print number 8068a |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05683 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to housing