NY A08095 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.481
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on November 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-11 - signed chap.481
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division of veterans' services to maintain a discharge upgrade advisory board program to provide written non-binding advisory opinions to veterans of the state of New York who are appealing their character of discharge from the discharge review board or the board for corrections of military or naval records for their branch of service on the federal level.
Title
Directs the division of veterans' services to maintain a discharge upgrade advisory board program to provide written non-binding advisory opinions to veterans of the state of New York who are appealing their character of discharge from the discharge review board or the board for corrections of military or naval records for their branch of service on the federal level.
Sponsors
Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] |
Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] | Asm. Michael DenDekker [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.481 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1723 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6467 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.303 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.303 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 8095a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S06467 (Same As) 2019-11-11 - signed chap.481