NY A08097 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Passed on November 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - SIGNED CHAP.490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Passed on November 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-12 - SIGNED CHAP.490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to discharged LGBT veterans; defines "LGBT veteran" and "qualifying condition"; adds veterans who have qualifying conditions or who are discharged as an LGBT veteran to certain provisions that apply to veterans who have been honorably discharged or released from military service.
Title
Relates to discharged LGBT veterans; defines "LGBT veteran" and "qualifying condition"; adds veterans who have qualifying conditions or who are discharged as an LGBT veteran to certain provisions that apply to veterans who have been honorably discharged or released from military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.490 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.305 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a8097 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 45B |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1020 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 45A |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s45b |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.305 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.305 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S00045 (Same As) 2019-11-12 - SIGNED CHAP.490