NY A08098 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the preparation of recommendations for best practices in treating livestock and farm property for Asian longhorned tick treatment, prevention and management.
Title
Requires the preparation of recommendations for best practices in treating livestock and farm property for Asian longhorned tick treatment, prevention and management.
Sponsors
Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. D. Billy Jones [D] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.58 |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.674 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.425 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a8098 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4876A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1143 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4876a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.425 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.425 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04876 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.58