NY A08100 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.609
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.609
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of East Hampton, in the county of Suffolk, to alienate parklands for the purpose of establishing a hospital emergency room.
Title
Authorizes the town of East Hampton, in the county of Suffolk, to alienate parklands for the purpose of establishing a hospital emergency room.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.609 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.525 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8100 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1618 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6291 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.525 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.525 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06291 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.609