NY A08104 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes care and services provided by licensed clinical social workers eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.
Title
Makes care and services provided by licensed clinical social workers eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.149 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.426 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a8104 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1110 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5960 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.426 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.426 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05960 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.149