NY A08106 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - approval memo.30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - approval memo.30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for wage payment violations; relates to liability of members of limited liability companies and establishes the wage theft prevention enforcement account.
Title
Increases penalties for wage payment violations; relates to liability of members of limited liability companies and establishes the wage theft prevention enforcement account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | approval memo.30 |
2014-12-29 | Senate | signed chap.537 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1605 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5885B |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.450 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.450 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 8106c |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | print number 8106b |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | print number 8106a |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05885 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8106C