NY A08110 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of environmental conservation to prepare recommendations for best practices in treating residential properties for tick prevention and management.
Title
Requires the department of environmental conservation to prepare recommendations for best practices in treating residential properties for tick prevention and management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.685 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | print number 8110a |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05802 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - referred to environmental conservation