NY A08123 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.526
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to preserving ecological integrity, wildlife and open space in the Adirondack park; strengthens land use and development provisions in the Adirondack park so as to curtail rural sprawl.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to preserving ecological integrity, wildlife and open space in the Adirondack park; strengthens land use and development provisions in the Adirondack park so as to curtail rural sprawl.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.526
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.526
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 8123a
2019-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-03Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S06484 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback