NY A08124 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the exceptions to certain effluent limitations in Nassau and Suffolk counties and requires certain eligible projects for state aid involving water pollution control revolving fund agreements to take county-wide or regional wastewater planning into consideration when determining eligibility.
Title
Limits the exceptions to certain effluent limitations in Nassau and Suffolk counties and requires certain eligible projects for state aid involving water pollution control revolving fund agreements to take county-wide or regional wastewater planning into consideration when determining eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.311 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.311 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | print number 8124a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06384 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION