NY A08140 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Introduced on August 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-28 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the creation of state debt in the amount of 1 billion dollars in creating the Alzheimer's research bond act of 2014 and provides for submission to the people of such proposal.
Title
Authorizes the creation of state debt in the amount of 1 billion dollars in creating the Alzheimer's research bond act of 2014 and provides for submission to the people of such proposal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S06284 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - REFERRED TO FINANCE