NY A08140 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.340
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.340
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the NYC housing authority to provide a notice of opportunity to meet to discuss possible termination of tenancy when an occupant is aged 62 years or older.
Title
Requires the NYC housing authority to provide a notice of opportunity to meet to discuss possible termination of tenancy when an occupant is aged 62 years or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.340 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.393 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3342A |
2016-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.334 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.509 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.509 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | print number 8140a |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03342 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8140A