NY A08142 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - substituted by s6266d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to minimum wage rates for covered airport workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to minimum wage rates for covered airport workers.

Sponsors

Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]
Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]
Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]
Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]

Roll Calls

2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22Assemblysubstituted by s6266d
2020-07-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.174
2020-07-20Assemblyrules report cal.174
2020-07-20Assemblyreported
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-07-15Assemblyreported referred to codes
2020-07-10Assemblyprint number 8142e
2020-07-10Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2020-02-10Assemblyprint number 8142d
2020-02-10Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2020-01-09Assemblyprint number 8142c
2020-01-09Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to labor
2019-09-11Assemblyprint number 8142b
2019-09-11Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2019-08-19Assemblyprint number 8142a
2019-08-19Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to labor
2019-06-04Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S06266 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8142
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08142
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08142A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08142B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08142C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08142D
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08142E
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08142&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback