NY A08144 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - print number 8144a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - print number 8144a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that only products containing milk may use the term "milk product" on labels and advertisements; defines "milk product".
Title
Provides that only products containing milk may use the term "milk product" on labels and advertisements; defines "milk product".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Assembly | print number 8144a |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07997 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION