NY A08145 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.603
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.603
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Bais Trany of Monsey, Inc. to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes Bais Trany of Monsey, Inc. to file an application for a retroactive real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.603 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.611 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8145 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1513 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5586 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.611 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.611 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05586 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.603