NY A08159 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to granting peace officer status to uniformed members of the bureau of fire prevention of the town of Islip.
Title
Relates to granting peace officer status to uniformed members of the bureau of fire prevention of the town of Islip.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.632 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.662 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8159 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1812 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3122 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.662 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03122 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.632