NY A08160 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an individual who was an eligible youth who was not determined to be a youthful offender by the sentencing court may apply to such court for a new determination after at least five years have passed since the imposition of the sentence, or at least five years after the individual's latest release from incarceration, if such individual was sentenced to a period of incarceration.
Title
Provides that an individual who was an eligible youth who was not determined to be a youthful offender by the sentencing court may apply to such court for a new determination after at least five years have passed since the imposition of the sentence, or at least five years after the individual's latest release from incarceration, if such individual was sentenced to a period of incarceration.
Sponsors
Asm. Aravella Simotas [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] |
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.314 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.612 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.612 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06572 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES