NY A08164 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to energy services company marketing standards; enacts provisions restricting telemarketing to customers who enroll in an opt-out registry.
Title
Relates to energy services company marketing standards; enacts provisions restricting telemarketing to customers who enroll in an opt-out registry.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-29 | Senate | vetoed memo.571 |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1524 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7811 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.269 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.269 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | print number 8164b |
2014-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | print number 8164a |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07811 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8164B