NY A08164 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to impairments of health, presumption and Staph/MRSA.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to impairments of health, presumption and Staph/MRSA.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.284
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.743
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3770B
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.47
2018-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.47
2018-06-06Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-23Assemblyprint number 8164b
2018-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2018-03-26Assemblyprint number 8164a
2018-03-26Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2017-06-01Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S03770 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8164B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08164&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08164&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08164
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08164&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08164A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08164&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08164B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08164&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08164&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08164&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08164&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8164#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback