NY A08171 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires stretch limousines to use commercial global positioning system technology which takes into account the minimum clearance, weight restriction, or turning radius of the motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires stretch limousines to use commercial global positioning system technology which takes into account the minimum clearance, weight restriction, or turning radius of the motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.473
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.473
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 8171a
2019-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2019-06-05Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S06187 (Same As) 2019-06-06 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08171&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08171&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08171
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08171&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08171A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08171&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08171&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08171&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08171&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback