NY A08174 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defines a hotel license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defines a hotel license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.230
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.151
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6119
2018-03-27SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-03-27Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-27Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.591
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.314
2017-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.314
2017-06-14Assemblyreported
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-01Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S06119 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8174

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08174&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08174&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08174
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08174&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08174&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08174&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8174#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback