NY A08179 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 8179a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 8179a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to additional member contributions for certain members under the age fifty-seven retirement program; provides that members holding certain titles who due to their age at the time of enrollment in the age fifty-seven retirement program will not obtain twenty-five years of service credit and therefore will not be eligible for a refund of their additional member contributions shall not be required to make additional member contributions.
Title
Relates to additional member contributions for certain members under the age fifty-seven retirement program; provides that members holding certain titles who due to their age at the time of enrollment in the age fifty-seven retirement program will not obtain twenty-five years of service credit and therefore will not be eligible for a refund of their additional member contributions shall not be required to make additional member contributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | print number 8179a |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05900 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5900B