NY A08182 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 8182a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 8182a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that service retirement benefits for members of the NYC police pension fund shall not be reduced by the primary social security retirement benefit commencing at age sixty-two.
Title
Provides that service retirement benefits for members of the NYC police pension fund shall not be reduced by the primary social security retirement benefit commencing at age sixty-two.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | print number 8182a |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05924 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - PRINT NUMBER 5924C