NY A08212 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of health to conduct a study and issue a report examining the unmet health and resource needs facing pregnant women in New York and the impact of limited service pregnancy centers on the ability of women to obtain accurate, non-coercive health care information and timely access to a comprehensive range of reproductive and sexual health care services.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of health to conduct a study and issue a report examining the unmet health and resource needs facing pregnant women in New York and the impact of limited service pregnancy centers on the ability of women to obtain accurate, non-coercive health care information and timely access to a comprehensive range of reproductive and sexual health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.318 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.528 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.528 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06311 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES