NY A08214 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of transportation to establish, maintain, monitor and publicize a hotline operated and maintained by the department of motor vehicles through which any person may report safety issues with stretch limousines and to use such reports when determining withdrawing a motor carrier's operating authority or denying applications for new or revised operating authority.
Title
Requires the commissioner of transportation to establish, maintain, monitor and publicize a hotline operated and maintained by the department of motor vehicles through which any person may report safety issues with stretch limousines and to use such reports when determining withdrawing a motor carrier's operating authority or denying applications for new or revised operating authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | signed chap.5 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.74 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6185B |
2020-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.3 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.3 |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | print number 8214b |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | print number 8214a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06185 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - signed chap.5