NY A08227 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Johel E. Dongo, Carl Cacace Jr., Douglas Parrish and Christopher Saya, firefighters in the Arlington fire district, in the county of Dutchess, to elect to participate in an optional 20 year retirement program.
Title
Authorizes Johel E. Dongo, Carl Cacace Jr., Douglas Parrish and Christopher Saya, firefighters in the Arlington fire district, in the county of Dutchess, to elect to participate in an optional 20 year retirement program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.128 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1162 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6333B |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.916 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | print number 8227a |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.626 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.626 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06333 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8227A