NY A08228 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any change of enrollment after February fourteenth shall take effect seven days after the succeeding June primary.
Title
Provides that any change of enrollment after February fourteenth shall take effect seven days after the succeeding June primary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.316 |
2019-09-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.434 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8228b |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1670 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6532A |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6532a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.434 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.434 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 8228b |
2019-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 8228a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06422 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06532 (Same As) 2019-09-26 - SIGNED CHAP.316
S06532 (Same As) 2019-09-26 - SIGNED CHAP.316