NY A08239 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to including the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton, trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of East Hampton and the trustees of Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of section 72-h of the general municipal law.
Title
Extends the expiration of provisions relating to including the trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton, trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of East Hampton and the trustees of Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of section 72-h of the general municipal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.128 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.530 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8239 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1461 |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6426 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.530 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.530 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06426 (Same As) 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.128