NY A08242 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a two generation pilot program to promote family stability and children's school readiness, and provides for the repeal of this section in five years.
Title
Establishes a two generation pilot program to promote family stability and children's school readiness, and provides for the repeal of this section in five years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-24 | Assembly | print number 8242a |
2020-01-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | referred to social services |