NY A08248 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - print number 8248a
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - print number 8248a
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force to examine, evaluate and determine how to improve mental health and suicide prevention for our veterans.
Title
Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force to examine, evaluate and determine how to improve mental health and suicide prevention for our veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | print number 8248a |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02248 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to veterans' affairs