NY A08276 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the department of labor, in consultation with the commissioners of the office of temporary and disability assistance, the department of health, the office of children and family services, and the department of taxation and finance to conduct a study on the impact that the increase in minimum wage has or will have on the eligibility of the working poor to receive certain income-based programs, subsidies and services.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the department of labor, in consultation with the commissioners of the office of temporary and disability assistance, the department of health, the office of children and family services, and the department of taxation and finance to conduct a study on the impact that the increase in minimum wage has or will have on the eligibility of the working poor to receive certain income-based programs, subsidies and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.221 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.677 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8276a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1555 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5202A |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5202a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.677 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | print number 8276a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05202 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.221